TX SB1407 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to encouraging age-appropriate normalcy activities for children in the managing conservatorship of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to encouraging age-appropriate normalcy activities for children in the managing conservatorship of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-15 - House - SB 1407Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-29 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-15HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-15HouseRecord vote
2015-05-15HousePassed
2015-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-15HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-15HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-05-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-01HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2015-05-01HouseRead first time
2015-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenatePassed
2015-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-09SenateRecord vote
2015-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-04-07SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-03-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2015-03-18SenateRead first time
2015-03-12SenateFiled
2015-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback