TX SB1406 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of the commissioner of insurance to request a state innovation waiver for certain small group health benefit plans of certain federal actuarial value and level of coverage requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of the commissioner of insurance to request a state innovation waiver for certain small group health benefit plans of certain federal actuarial value and level of coverage requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1115 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Effective immediately
2017-05-23 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-11SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-11SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HousePassed
2017-05-10HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-16SenateRead first time
2017-03-07SenateFiled
2017-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback