TX SB1401 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to quarantine leave for fire fighters, peace officers, and emergency medical technicians employed by, appointed by, or elected for a political subdivision.
Title
Relating to quarantine leave for fire fighters, peace officers, and emergency medical technicians employed by, appointed by, or elected for a political subdivision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2073 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Law Enforcement
SICK LEAVE
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Law Enforcement
SICK LEAVE