TX SB1397 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regional protocols and processes for patient transfers and related services within the geographic area served by certain trauma service area regional advisory councils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regional protocols and processes for patient transfers and related services within the geographic area served by certain trauma service area regional advisory councils.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3581 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Public Health
HB3581 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1397
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01397I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01397S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01397E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01397H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01397F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01397I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01397I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01397H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01397H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01397F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1397&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=35

Bill Comments 750

feedback