TX SB1388 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the unlawful disclosure of an autopsy image or other visual depiction; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the unlawful disclosure of an autopsy image or other visual depiction; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-05-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Crieghton |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTOPSIES
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General