TX SB1381 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to photo identification for certain debit or credit card transactions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to photo identification for certain debit or credit card transactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 1/1/18
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-05HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Investments & Financial Services
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-16SenateRead first time
2017-03-06SenateFiled
2017-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback