TX SB1376 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration, implementation, and enforcement of federal produce safety standards by the Department of Agriculture.
Title
Relating to the administration, implementation, and enforcement of federal produce safety standards by the Department of Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2397 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1376 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01376I.htm |