TX SB1376 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to specialty license plates issued to retired members of the United States armed forces.
Title
Relating to specialty license plates issued to retired members of the United States armed forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - SB 1376Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-20 | House | Amended |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2013-05-17 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-30 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2013-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |