TX SB1373 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the imposition and collection of fines, fees, and court costs in criminal cases.
Title
Relating to the imposition and collection of fines, fees, and court costs in criminal cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#910 (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#910 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 2441 |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Same As) 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2441 (Same As) 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2441 (Same As) 2021-05-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Criminal Procedure--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local