TX SB1372 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to costs associated with the destruction of certain deer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to costs associated with the destruction of certain deer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-15 Effective immediately
2023-05-15 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-04HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-04SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-03SenateReported enrolled
2023-05-03SenateHouse passage reported
2023-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#791
2023-05-02HousePassed
2023-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-02HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-02HousePassed to 3rd reading
2023-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-04-28HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-10HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2023-04-10HouseRead first time
2023-04-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2023-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2023-04-03SenateRecord vote
2023-04-03SenatePassed
2023-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2023-04-03SenateRecord vote
2023-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2023-04-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2023-04-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2023-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-03-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-03-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2023-03-27SenateVote taken in committee
2023-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-16SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2023-03-16SenateRead first time
2023-03-01SenateFiled
2023-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB5239 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Left pending in committee
HB5239 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB1372
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01372I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01372S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01372E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01372H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB01372F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01372I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01372I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01372S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01372S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01372H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB01372F.htm
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ04-03-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB1372&RcdVtNo=791&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2023

Bill Comments

feedback