TX SB1370 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to invoices and payments under certain state contracts for outside legal services.
Title
Relating to invoices and payments under certain state contracts for outside legal services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1426 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-16 | House | Record vote RV#1426 |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1834 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Lawyers
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Lawyers
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions