TX SB1362 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notification and informational materials regarding mutual consent voluntary adoption registries.
Title
Relating to notification and informational materials regarding mutual consent voluntary adoption registries.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Sen. Konni Burton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADOPTION
Family
Family--Parent & Child
MOTHERS' PRIVACY PROTECTION ACT
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VITAL STATISTICS & RECORDS
Family
Family--Parent & Child
MOTHERS' PRIVACY PROTECTION ACT
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
VITAL STATISTICS & RECORDS