TX SB1356 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to human trafficking and its victims and the care of juveniles who have experienced traumatic events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to human trafficking and its victims and the care of juveniles who have experienced traumatic events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - House - SB 1356Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-23SenateRecord vote
2013-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2013-05-23SenateRead
2013-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-20SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-20HouseRecord vote
2013-05-20HousePassed
2013-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-17HouseAmended
2013-05-17HouseAmended
2013-05-17HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-05-09HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2013-04-24HouseReferred to Corrections
2013-04-24HouseRead first time
2013-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-18SenateRecord vote
2013-04-18SenatePassed
2013-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-18SenateRecord vote
2013-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2013-03-18SenateRead first time
2013-03-07SenateFiled
2013-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback