TX SB1351 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to demand-side electric energy resources in the competitive electric market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to demand-side electric energy resources in the competitive electric market.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-06HouseReferred to State Affairs
2013-05-06HouseRead first time
2013-05-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-05-06SenateReported engrossed
2013-05-06SenateRecord vote
2013-05-06SenatePassed
2013-05-06SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-06SenateRecord vote
2013-05-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-06SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-05-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-08SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-03-18SenateRead first time
2013-03-07SenateFiled
2013-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback