TX SB1350 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by a certain hospital district.
Title
Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by a certain hospital district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1361 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3649 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital