TX SB1346 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disclosure of state agency contract information regarding administrator services for group health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to disclosure of state agency contract information regarding administrator services for group health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Insurance--Health & Accident
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions