TX SB1341 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligibility for certain benefits provided under public assistance programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility for certain benefits provided under public assistance programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1466 (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1466
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Goldman
2021-05-25HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-25HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Goldman
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenatePassed
2021-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1341
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01341I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01341S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01341E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01341H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01341F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01341H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01341I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01341I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01341H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01341F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1341&RcdVtNo=1466&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021

Bill Comments

feedback