TX SB1341 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a change of name and sex for certain persons and the issuance of associated vital records and documentation; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to a change of name and sex for certain persons and the issuance of associated vital records and documentation; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Sen. John Whitmire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BIRTH & DEATH CERTIFICATES
CHANGED & ASSUMED NAMES
Health
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
CHANGED & ASSUMED NAMES
Health
Health--General
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1341 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01341I.htm |