TX SB1338 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to bail and to judicial education regarding bail practices.
Title
Relating to bail and to judicial education regarding bail practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - FA1 Huffines (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - FA1 Huffines (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR50 (Enabling for) 2017-04-04 - No action taken in committee
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
MAGISTRATES
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
MAGISTRATES