TX SB1323 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to preemployment physical examinations for employment with the Texas Department of Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to preemployment physical examinations for employment with the Texas Department of Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1223 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective immediately
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1223
2021-05-18HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-13HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-31SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3283 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1323
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01323I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01323S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01323E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01323H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01323F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01323I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01323I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01323E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01323H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01323F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1323&RcdVtNo=1223&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback