TX SB1323 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a county to establish a centralized sex offender registration authority.
Title
Relating to the authority of a county to establish a centralized sex offender registration authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SEXUAL OFFENDERS