TX SB1322 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of possession or promotion of child pornography.
Title
Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of possession or promotion of child pornography.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PORNOGRAPHY
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PORNOGRAPHY