TX SB1322 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of possession or promotion of child pornography.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the punishment for certain conduct constituting the offense of possession or promotion of child pornography.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-16HouseRead first time
2017-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-12SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenatePassed
2017-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-12SenateRecord vote
2017-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-12SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-14SenateRead first time
2017-03-06SenateFiled
2017-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback