TX SB1318 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 9/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Postponed 9/1/23 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release of defendants on bail, the duties of a magistrate in certain criminal proceedings, and the notice provided by peace officers to adult victims of family violence.
Title
Relating to the release of defendants on bail, the duties of a magistrate in certain criminal proceedings, and the notice provided by peace officers to adult victims of family violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Postponed 9/1/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-21 | House | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-21 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2023-05-20 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2023-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Miles |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3400 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB3400 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB3400 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
HARRIS COUNTY
MAGISTRATES
PEACE OFFICERS
County Government--Employees/Officers
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
HARRIS COUNTY
MAGISTRATES
PEACE OFFICERS