TX SB1311 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the provision of and professional liability insurance coverage for gender transitioning or gender reassignment medical procedures and treatments for certain children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the provision of and professional liability insurance coverage for gender transitioning or gender reassignment medical procedures and treatments for certain children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-05-24HouseRead first time
2021-05-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-18SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-18SenateStatement(s) submitted
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenatePassed
2021-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenatePassed to engrossment
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Menéndez
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2021-05-17SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2693 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Referred to Public Health
HB1399 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB1399 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1311
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01311I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01311S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01311E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01311S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01311S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01311S2F3.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01311I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01311I.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-18-F.PDF#page=27

Bill Comments

feedback