TX SB1309 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the assessment and collection of ad valorem taxes imposed by a school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the assessment and collection of ad valorem taxes imposed by a school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02SenateAmended
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Paxton
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4335 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback