TX SB13 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-09 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of a permit by a political subdivision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of a permit by a political subdivision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-26 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-08-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-09HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-08-07HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-08-07HouseRead first time
2017-07-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenatePassed as amended
2017-07-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-26SenateAmended
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment adopted as amended
2017-07-26SenateAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2017-07-26SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment to amendment fails of adoption
2017-07-26SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-07-26SenateAmendment to amendment withdrawn
2017-07-26SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenateAmendment amended
2017-07-26SenateAmendment to amendment offered
2017-07-26SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-07-26SenateRead 2nd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-26SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-22SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-07-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-14SenateFiled
2017-07-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback