TX SB1295 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-16)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to financial support and incentives for comprehensive regional universities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to financial support and incentives for comprehensive regional universities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#996 (Y: 119 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-30 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#996
2021-05-12HousePassed
2021-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion CSHB 3175
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-21SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-21SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-13SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-31SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3175 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3175 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1295
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01295I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01295S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01295E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01295H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01295F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01295I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01295I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01295S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01295S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01295H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01295F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-21-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1295&RcdVtNo=996&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-21-F.PDF#page=10

Bill Comments 750

feedback