TX SB129 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility for the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of certain first responders.
Title
Relating to eligibility for the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of certain first responders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER PATROL AGENTS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions