TX SB1289 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the purchase of iron and steel products made in the United States for certain governmental entity projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the purchase of iron and steel products made in the United States for certain governmental entity projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1940 (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1245 (Y: 109 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1184 (Y: 114 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1183 (Y: 65 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to table fails (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-27SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-26HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-21SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-21SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-19HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-19HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-18HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-18HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-18HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-17SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-17SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-17SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-17SenateRead
2017-05-17SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HousePassed
2017-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-11HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-11HouseAmended
2017-05-11HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-11HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-11HousePostponed
2017-05-11HousePoint of order withdrawn
2017-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-11HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenatePassed
2017-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateMotion to table fails
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-13SenateRead first time
2017-03-03SenateFiled
2017-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1289
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01289I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01289S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01289E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01289H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01289F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=30
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1289&RcdVtNo=1183&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1289&RcdVtNo=1184&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1289&RcdVtNo=1245&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1289&RcdVtNo=1940&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=32
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=31
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=104

Bill Comments

feedback