TX SB1280 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to attaining reserve capacity margins in power regions to meet expected peak demand.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to attaining reserve capacity margins in power regions to meet expected peak demand.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-13SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-03-13SenateRead first time
2013-03-06SenateFiled
2013-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback