TX SB1278 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the responsibility for ancillary services costs incurred for the operation of intermittent generation resources.
Title
Relating to the responsibility for ancillary services costs incurred for the operation of intermittent generation resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4466 (Same As) 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Energy
Energy--Solar
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Energy
Energy--Solar
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Utilities
Utilities--Electric