TX SB1275 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to facility fees charged by certain health care providers; providing an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to facility fees charged by certain health care providers; providing an administrative penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-04-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-04-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-09SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2023-03-09SenateRead first time
2023-02-27SenateFiled
2023-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1692 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Left pending in committee
HB1692 (Same As) 2023-04-13 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback