TX SB1270 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public information law.
Title
Relating to the public information law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-16 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-31 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Open Government, Select | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed | |
2011-03-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |