TX SB1265 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of the National Hot Rod Association Fall Nationals at the Texas Motorplex for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of the National Hot Rod Association Fall Nationals at the Texas Motorplex for funding under the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#785 (Y: 105 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#785 |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2132 |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General