TX SB1264 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-26)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to consumer protections against certain medical and health care billing by certain out-of-network providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to consumer protections against certain medical and health care billing by certain out-of-network providers.

Sponsors

Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]
Sen. John Whitmire [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Tracy King [D]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. James White [R]Rep. John Wray [R]
Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1533 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24SenateRecord vote
2019-05-24SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-24SenateRead
2019-05-24SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1533
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Oliverson
2019-05-20HouseAmendment amended 2-Oliverson
2019-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Oliverson
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-16HouseRecommitted to committee
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmendment adopted as amended FA1 Hancock
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmendment amended
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA6 Schwertner
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment fails of adoption
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA5 Campbell
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment fails of adoption
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA4 Schwertner
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment fails of adoption
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA3 Schwertner
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmendment amended
2019-04-16SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA2 Huffman
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-28SenateFiled
2019-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3933 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1264
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01264I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01264S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01264E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01264H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=40
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=68
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=69
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=70
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=71
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1264&RcdVtNo=1533&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019

Bill Comments

feedback