TX SB1258 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the duty of a lessee or other agent in control of certain state land to drill an offset well, pay compensatory royalty, or otherwise protect the land from drainage of oil or gas by a horizontal drainhole well located on certain land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the duty of a lessee or other agent in control of certain state land to drill an offset well, pay compensatory royalty, or otherwise protect the land from drainage of oil or gas by a horizontal drainhole well located on certain land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1396 (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1396
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-05HouseReferred to Energy Resources
2021-05-05HouseRead first time
2021-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenatePassed
2021-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-03SenateRecord vote
2021-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03SenateAmended
2021-05-03SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
2021-05-03SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3409 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1258
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01258I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01258S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01258E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01258H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01258F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01258S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01258I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01258I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01258S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01258S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01258E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01258H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01258F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=32
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1258&RcdVtNo=1396&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback