TX SB1257 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the information required to be provided by the chief appraiser of an appraisal district to the comptroller in connection with the comptroller's central registry of reinvestment zones designated and ad valorem tax abatement agreements executed under the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the information required to be provided by the chief appraiser of an appraisal district to the comptroller in connection with the comptroller's central registry of reinvestment zones designated and ad valorem tax abatement agreements executed under the Property Redevelopment and Tax Abatement Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1359 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1359
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1257
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01257I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01257S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01257E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01257H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01257F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01257I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01257I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01257E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01257H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01257F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1257&RcdVtNo=1359&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback