TX SB1254 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an interstate compact on border security and immigration enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an interstate compact on border security and immigration enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-13HouseRead first time
2021-05-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-12SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenatePassed
2021-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-11SenateRecord vote
2021-05-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-11SenateRecord vote
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3651 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to State Affairs
HB3651 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1254
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01254I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01254S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01254E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01254H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01254I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01254I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01254S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01254S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01254H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-11-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-11-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-12-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-12-F.PDF#page=27

Bill Comments 750

feedback