TX SB1249 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to adverse possession of real property by a cotenant heir against other cotenant heirs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to adverse possession of real property by a cotenant heir against other cotenant heirs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1249 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-05SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenatePassed
2017-04-05SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-13SenateRead first time
2017-03-03SenateFiled
2017-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback