TX SB1248 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to municipal regulation of manufactured home communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to municipal regulation of manufactured home communities.


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1956 (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1470 (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1437 (Y: 56 N: 69 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-26SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-20HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HouseMotion to table fails
2017-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-13SenateRead first time
2017-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1248&RcdVtNo=1437&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1248&RcdVtNo=1470&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1248&RcdVtNo=1956&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=38

Bill Comments