TX SB124 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a county to require electronic bids or proposals for competitive bidding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a county to require electronic bids or proposals for competitive bidding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-01HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3898 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback