TX SB1235 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to verification of the accuracy of voter registration applications and voter registration lists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to verification of the accuracy of voter registration applications and voter registration lists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22SenateTagged
2021-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-16SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3828 (Similar To) 2021-03-23 - Referred to Elections
HB3828 (Similar To) 2021-03-23 - Referred to Elections

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback