TX SB1225 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Elections
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenatePassed
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateFiled
2019-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4537 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Elections

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback