TX SB1206 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to the release from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice of certain inmates who complete a rehabilitation program.
Title
Relating to the release from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice of certain inmates who complete a rehabilitation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-30 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-29 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-29 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-23 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-23 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-23 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-21 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-21 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-21 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-21 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-21 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-21 | Read | |
2009-05-21 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Record vote | |
2009-05-13 | Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-12 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-12 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-09 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-09 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed | |
2009-02-27 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1899 (Same As) 2009-03-05 - Referred to Corrections
HB1958 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1958 (Same As) 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF