TX SB1203 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of subpoenas or certain other court orders with respect to an online service provider in the investigation or prosecution of certain criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to the issuance of subpoenas or certain other court orders with respect to an online service provider in the investigation or prosecution of certain criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-22 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
SEARCH WARRANTS
SUBPOENAS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
SEARCH WARRANTS
SUBPOENAS