TX SB1202 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain utility provisions to a vehicle charging service.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain utility provisions to a vehicle charging service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1283 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1283 |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |