TX SB12 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reduction of the amount of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed by a school district on the residence homestead of an individual who is elderly or disabled to reflect any reduction from the preceding tax year in the district's maximum compressed rate.
Title
Relating to the reduction of the amount of a limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed by a school district on the residence homestead of an individual who is elderly or disabled to reflect any reduction from the preceding tax year in the district's maximum compressed rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - FA2 Bettencourt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - FA1 Bettencourt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - FA2 Bettencourt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - FA1 Bettencourt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Passed |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Amended |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Bettencourt |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Amended |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-07-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-07-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-07-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB126 (Same As) 2021-07-09 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB20 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Filed
SJR4 (Enabling for) 2021-07-14 - Reported engrossed
HB223 (Same As) 2021-07-09 - Filed
SB20 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Filed
SJR4 (Enabling for) 2021-07-14 - Reported engrossed
HB223 (Same As) 2021-07-09 - Filed
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation--School District