TX SB1193 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the liability of and issuance of titles and permits for motor vehicles purchased from motor vehicle dealers that go out of business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the liability of and issuance of titles and permits for motor vehicles purchased from motor vehicle dealers that go out of business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseNo action taken in committee
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenatePassed
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenateRecord vote
2019-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-29SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateFiled
2019-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback