TX SB1185 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Business & Industry
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Business & Industry
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal history record information obtained or disseminated by certain private entities; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to criminal history record information obtained or disseminated by certain private entities; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
CRIMINAL RECORDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
CRIMINAL RECORDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF